Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2804249

EP2804249 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.07.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
[2014/47]
Inventor(s)01 / TAKAHASHI, Kenji
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)J A Kemp LLP
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/35]J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2014/47]Jackson, Martin Peter
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date12865256.713.01.2012
[2017/35]
WO2012JP00190
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013105140
Date:18.07.2013
Language:JA
[2013/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2804249
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2804249
Date:30.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP18.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01M10/44, H01M10/48, H02J7/00, G01R31/36, // H01M10/052
[2017/15]
Former International [2015/24]H01M10/44, H01M10/48, H02J7/00, G01R31/36, // H01M10/0525
Former International [2014/47]H01M10/44, H01M10/48, H02J7/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINER SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE[2014/47]
English:METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING SECONDARY BATTERY[2014/47]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE BATTERIE RECHARGEABLE[2014/47]
Entry into regional phase14.07.2014Translation filed 
14.07.2014National basic fee paid 
14.07.2014Search fee paid 
14.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
14.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
08.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2017Fee for grant paid
18.07.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.07.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.03.2017
Opposition(s)31.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
IE13.01.2018
LU13.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
[2019/30]
Former [2019/09]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
IE13.01.2018
LU13.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2018/52]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
LU13.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2018/50]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
LU13.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
Former [2018/47]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
LU13.01.2018
Former [2018/39]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/25]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/21]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/15]AT30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/12]AT30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/11]AT30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/10]AT30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Former [2018/09]FI30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[IY]JP2001015177  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [I] 1,4 * abstract * [Y] 1-4;
 [Y]EP2325664  (TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO KK [JP]; TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP] TOYOTA MOTOR C) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0032] , [0036]; figures 8,9 *
International search[X]JP2001015177  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD.);
 [X]JPH06290817  (HITACHI, LTD.);
 [A]JP2000030754  (NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.);
 [A]JPH1167280  (MITSUBISHI CABLE INDUSTRIES, LTD.)
by applicantJPH0923512
 JP2006345634
 JP2008198434
 JP2009199934
 JP2009199936
 JP2008243373
 JP2008241246
 JP2010060384
 JP2000030754