Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2804244

EP2804244 - OXYGEN REDUCTION CATALYST AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.01.2019
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Showa Denko K.K.
13-9 Shibadaimon 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8518 / JP
[2014/47]
Inventor(s)01 / TEZUKA, Noriyasu
c/o SHOWA DENKO K.K.
13-9 Shibadaimon 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8518 / JP
02 / HORIKITA, Masaki
c/o SHOWA DENKO K.K.
13-9 Shibadaimon 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8518 / JP
03 / YOSHIMURA, Masayuki
c/o SHOWA DENKO K.K.
13-9 Shibadaimon 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8518 / JP
04 / ITO, Yuji
c/o SHOWA DENKO K.K.
13-9 Shibadaimon 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8518 / JP
05 / SATO, Takashi
c/o SHOWA DENKO K.K.
13-9 Shibadaimon 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8518 / JP
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/47]Tack, Jens
Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date12865421.719.07.2012
WO2012JP68343
Priority number, dateJP2012000524313.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012005243
[2014/47]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013105292
Date:18.07.2013
Language:JA
[2013/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2804244
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP18.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01M4/90, B01J27/24, B01J37/08, H01M4/88, H01M4/86, H01M8/10, H01M4/92
[2015/45]
Former International [2014/47]H01M4/90, B01J27/24, B01J37/08, H01M4/88
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
TitleGerman:SAUERSTOFFREDUKTIONSKATALYSATOR UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG[2014/47]
English:OXYGEN REDUCTION CATALYST AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME[2014/47]
French:CATALYSEUR DE RÉDUCTION D'OXYGÈNE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION[2014/47]
Entry into regional phase14.07.2014Translation filed 
13.08.2014National basic fee paid 
13.08.2014Search fee paid 
13.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
25.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
29.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.01.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
31.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
31.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2011099493  (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 EP2535971  [ ] (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]) [ ] * paragraph [0154] - paragraph [0159] * * paragraph [0250] - paragraph [0254]; figures 5,8; table 1 * * paragraphs [0325] - [0333] - [0341] , [0342]; tables 3.1-3.6 *;
 [Y]WO2010126020  (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [P]EP2428268  (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]) [P] * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0121] * * paragraph [0151] - paragraph [0176]; table 1 * * figure 3 *;
 [Y]JP2011115760  (NISSHINBO HOLDINGS INC, et al) [Y] 1 * the whole document *;
 EP2511008  [ ] (NISSHINBO HOLDINGS INC [JP], et al) [ ] * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0113] *;
 [Y]WO2006088194  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * the whole document *;
 EP1852180  [ ] (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [ ] * paragraphs [0012] , [0016] - [0018] *;
 [Y]EP2258475  (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]) [Y] 5-7 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0046] *;
 [Y]JP2011194328  (NEC CORP, et al) [Y] 5-7 * abstract *
International search[Y]WO2011099493  (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al);
 [Y]WO2010126020  (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al);
 [Y]JP2011115760  (NISSHINBO HOLDINGS INC, et al);
 [Y]WO2006088194  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al)
by applicantJP2011115760
 WO2011099493
 WO2010126020
 WO2009104500