Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2804244 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2804244



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 277
29.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.01.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
29.01.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 9
29.01.2019 Claims Search / examination 5
29.01.2019 Description Search / examination 8
29.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.01.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.01.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
18.01.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.01.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
31.07.2018 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.07.2018 Enquiry as to the processing of the file Search / examination 1
12.07.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.07.2018 Deficiencies in an enquiry Search / examination 1
25.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.04.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
25.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
25.04.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
25.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.10.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
02.10.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.10.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 6
02.10.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 3
22.09.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
27.03.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
27.03.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
24.03.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
22.10.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
27.08.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
25.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.08.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
28.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
28.07.2014 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
14.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
14.07.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.07.2014 Claims Search / examination 5
14.07.2014 Description Search / examination 84
14.07.2014 Drawings Search / examination 2
14.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
23.05.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
07.08.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 35
18.07.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
18.07.2013 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
18.07.2013 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 53