Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2804244


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
03.08.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.02.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
29.01.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
18.01.2019 First examination report
03.08.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.08.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.08.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.05.2016 Amendment by applicant
02.10.2015 Change - classification published on  04.11.2015  [2015/45]
02.10.2015 Change - classification published on  04.11.2015  [2015/45]
02.10.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  04.11.2015  [2015/45]
01.08.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.03.2015 Change - representative
20.03.2015 Change - extension states published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
17.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.11.2014  [2014/47]
17.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  19.11.2014  [2014/47]
29.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
19.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
19.08.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
15.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
19.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication