Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2802523

EP2802523 - ELEVATOR TRAVELLING CABLE PROTECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.09.2018
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Otis Elevator Company
One Carrier Place
Farmington CT 06032 / US
[2017/36]
Former [2014/47]For all designated states
Otis Elevator Company
Ten Farm Springs Road
Farmington, CT 06032-2568 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FAUCONNET, Aurélien
10 route de Sully
F-45620 Isdes / FR
02 / MAUGUEN, Valérie
23 allée du Bec d'Able
F-45600 Sully Sur Loire / FR
03 / DELACHATRE, Etienne
55 route de Sully sur Loire
F-45730 Saint Benoît / FR
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Pelkovenstraße 143
80992 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/47]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
Application number, filing date12865494.410.01.2012
WO2012IB00129
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013104942
Date:18.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2802523
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013
[2014/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR18.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:B66B7/06
[2016/45]
Former International [2014/47]B66B7/06, B66B7/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
TitleGerman:SCHUTZ EINES FÖRDERKABELS EINES AUFZUGS[2014/47]
English:ELEVATOR TRAVELLING CABLE PROTECTION[2014/47]
French:PROTECTION DE CÂBLE MOBILE D'ASCENSEUR[2014/47]
Entry into regional phase01.08.2014National basic fee paid 
01.08.2014Search fee paid 
01.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
25.04.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.09.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
28.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
24.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
24.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201908   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2005350214  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]JPS55140059U  (--) [A] 1-9 * figure 1 *
International search[X]JP2005350214  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP);
 [A]US6786306  (TINER JAMES L [US]);
 [A]US5080199  (MCCALLUM III WILLIAM J [US])
by applicantJP2005350214