Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2806451

EP2806451 - DRIVE METHOD FOR SPATIAL LIGHT MODULATOR, METHOD FOR GENERATING PATTERN FOR EXPOSURE, AND EXPOSURE METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.04.2019
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.04.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nikon Corporation
15-3, Konan 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-6290 / JP
[2015/36]
Former [2014/48]For all designated states
Nikon Corporation
12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8331 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / OWA, Soichi
c/o NIKON CORPORATION
Intellectual Property Headquarters
12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8331 / JP
02 / WATANABE, Yoji
c/o NIKON CORPORATION
Intellectual Property Headquarters
12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8331 / JP
 [2015/18]
Former [2014/48]01 / OWA Soichi
c/o NIKON CORPORATION
Intellectual Property Headquarters
12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8331 / JP
02 / WATANABE Yoji
c/o NIKON CORPORATION
Intellectual Property Headquarters
12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8331 / JP
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2014/48]
Application number, filing date12865561.026.12.2012
WO2012JP83753
Priority number, dateJP2012000772718.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012007727
[2014/48]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013108560
Date:25.07.2013
Language:JA
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2806451
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP25.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/027, G02B26/08, G03F7/20, G02F1/29
[2016/20]
Former International [2014/48]H01L21/027, G02B26/08, G03F7/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
TitleGerman:ANSTEUERVERFAHREN FÜR EINEN RAUMLICHTMODULATOR, VERFAHREN ZUM ERZEUGEN EINES BELICHTUNGSMUSTERS SOWIE BELICHTUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG[2014/48]
English:DRIVE METHOD FOR SPATIAL LIGHT MODULATOR, METHOD FOR GENERATING PATTERN FOR EXPOSURE, AND EXPOSURE METHOD AND DEVICE[2014/48]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE POUR MODULATEUR SPATIAL DE LUMIÈRE, PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION DE MOTIF POUR EXPOSITION ET PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'EXPOSITION[2014/48]
Entry into regional phase13.08.2014Translation filed 
13.08.2014National basic fee paid 
13.08.2014Search fee paid 
13.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
16.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.04.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2003076404  (TANIGUCHI YUKIO [JP]) [X] 1,4,7,8,13,15,17,18 * paragraphs [0058] , [0060] , [0 66] - [0068]; figure 4b * [Y] 2,3,5,6,9-12,14,16;
 [Y]US2008073588  (KRUIT PIETER [NL], et al) [Y] 2,3,9,14 * paragraphs [0049] , [0 50]; figures 5a, 5b *;
 [Y]US2008074700  (OLSSON MARTIN [SE], et al) [Y] 2,3,9,14 * paragraph [0158]; figure 16a *;
 [Y]US2004150868  (LJUNGBLAD ULRIC [SE], et al) [Y] 5,6,16 * paragraph [0103] *;
 [Y]US2005243397  (LATYPOV AZAT M [US]) [Y] 10-12 * paragraphs [0029] - [0031]; figure 1 *
International search[A]JP2005536875  (MASKLESS LITHOGRAPHY, INC.);
 [A]JP2006128194  (CANON KK);
 [A]WO0241196  (BALL SEMICONDUCTOR INC [US]);
 [A]US6312134  (JAIN KANTI [US], et al);
 [XP]WO2012043497  (NIKON CORP [JP], et al)
by applicantWO2009060745
 US2007242247
 US5312513
 US6885493
    - YIJIAN CHEN ET AL., "Design and fabrication of tilting and piston micromirrors for maskless lithography", PROC. OFSPIE (USA, (2005), vol. 5751, pages 1023 - 1037