Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2805235

EP2805235 - WARNING TRACK INTERRUPTION FACILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.09.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.09.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[2014/48]
Inventor(s)01 / GAINEY JR, Charles
IBM Corporation
c/o Intellectual Property Law Department
2455 South Road
MS P386
Poughkeepsie New York 12601 / US
02 / MULDER, James
IBM Corporation
M/P B/706-2
WG02
2455 South Road
Poughkeepsie New York 12601-5400 / US
03 / FARRELL, Mark
IBM Corporation
M/P P310
2455 South Road
Poughkeepsie New York 12601-5400 / US
04 / BERNARD, Pierce
IBM Corporation
c/o Intellectual Property Law Department
2455 South Road
MS P386
Poughkeepsie New York 12601 / US
05 / SCHMIDT, Donald, William
IBM Corporation
M/P 7Q4A/P334
2455 South Road
Poughkeepsie New York 12601-5400 / US
06 / KUBALA, Jeffrey, Paul
IBM Corporation
M/P P340
2455 South Road
Poughkeepsie New York 12601-5400 / US
07 / ROGERS, Robert
IBM Corporation
c/o Intellectual Property Law Department
2455 South Road
MS P386
Poughkeepsie New York 12601 / US
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)Gascoyne, Belinda Jane , et al
IBM United Kingdom Limited
Intellectual Property Law
Hursley Park
Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/48]Stretton, Peter John
IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
Application number, filing date12865669.113.11.2012
WO2012IB56371
Priority number, dateUS20121335250918.01.2012         Original published format: US201213352509
[2014/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013108091
Date:25.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2805235
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2013
[2014/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US25.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/46, G06F9/48, G06F9/455, // G06F9/50, G06F9/54, G06F13/24
[2019/40]
Former International [2016/01]G06F9/46, G06F9/48
Former International [2014/48]G06F9/46
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
TitleGerman:WARNSPURUNTERBRECHUNGSANLAGE[2014/48]
English:WARNING TRACK INTERRUPTION FACILITY[2014/48]
French:FONCTION D'AVERTISSEMEMENT D'INTERRUPTION[2014/48]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2014National basic fee paid 
13.06.2014Search fee paid 
13.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
10.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
21.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.09.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.12.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
15.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
16.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
19.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]US6131166  (WONG-INSLEY BECKY [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 13, line 25 - column 14, line 25 *;
 [A]US5594893  (BYERS RUSSELL F [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 13 *;
 [A]US2011162087  (LAL AMIT [IN], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0033] *;
 [A]US7689998  (CHRYSANTHAKOPOULOS GEORGIOS [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 10 *;
 [AP]  - Bob Rogers, "Warning Track - Improving CPU utilization on zEC12", IBM Destination Z, (20130410), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://www.destinationz.org/Mainframe-Solution/Trends/Improving-CPU-utilization-on-zEC12, (20151120), XP055230096 [AP] 1 * the whole document *
 [AP]  - "IBM OA37803: NEW FUNCTION - RMF SUPPORT OF THE WARNING-TRACK-INTERRUPTION- FACILITY ON THE IBM ZENTERPRISE EC12 (ZEC12) SERVER (D/T2827)", (20130730), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://www-01.ibm.com/support/docview.wss?uid=isg1OA37803, (20151120), XP055230103 [AP] 1 * the whole document *
International search[X]US7536690  (ALVERSON, G ET AL.);
 [Y]US4001783  (MONAHAN, E ET AL.);
 [Y]US2010031254  (CHIN, Y ET AL.);
 [A]US7725531  (SOOD, A ET AL.)
by applicantUS7536690