Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2806545

EP2806545 - PERMANENT MAGNET TYPE ROTATING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.01.2017  [2017/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TMS Co. Ltd.
2-17-1 Keihinjima
Ota-ku
Tokyo 143-0003 / JP
[2014/48]
Inventor(s)01 / SHISHIDO Takayuki
2-17-1 Keihinjima
Ota-ku
Tokyo 143-0003 / JP
02 / ABE Katsuhisa
2-17-1 Keihinjima
Ota-ku
Tokyo 143-0003 / JP
03 / KOBATAKE Masao
2-17-1 Keihinjima
Ota-ku
Tokyo 143-0003 / JP
04 / SHINOHARA Kazuhisa
2-17-1 Keihinjima
Ota-ku
Tokyo 143-0003 / JP
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
[2014/48]
Application number, filing date12865823.428.12.2012
WO2012JP84198
Priority number, dateJP2012000978720.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012009787
[2014/48]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013108581
Date:25.07.2013
Language:JA
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2806545
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP25.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:H02K21/14, H02K29/06, H02P6/10
[2014/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
TitleGerman:PERMANENTMAGNET-DREHMASCHINE[2014/48]
English:PERMANENT MAGNET TYPE ROTATING MACHINE[2014/48]
French:MACHINE TOURNANTE DU TYPE À AIMANTS PERMANENTS[2014/48]
Entry into regional phase16.07.2014Translation filed 
16.07.2014National basic fee paid 
16.07.2014Search fee paid 
16.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
15.07.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/01]
22.08.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5258697  (FORD JAMES R [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * column 5, line 41 - column 7, line 23; figures 1-6, 9; claim 1 *;
 [Y]GB2293705  (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US2145791  (GILLE WILLIS H) [A] 2 * figures 1, 2 *;
 [A]US4745345  (PETERSEN CHRISTIAN C [US]) [A] 2 * column 8, line 1 - line 55; figure 7 *;
 [A]US2008001106  (IGARASHI KOUHEI [JP], et al) [A] 9 * figures 1-20; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0195551  (PRECISE POWER CORP [US]) [A] 12 * figure 1; claim 1 *
International search[A]JP2003061327  (KENKO KANKYO KENKYUSHO KK);
 [A]JP2003235227  (MINEBEA CO LTD);
 [A]JP2009118706  (KOMATSU YASUHIRO, et al);
 [A]JP2010259150  (TOSHIBA CORP);
 [A]WO03065549  (SHIGEN KAIHATSU SHA KK [JP], et al)
by applicantJP2009118706