Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2793429

EP2793429 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MANAGING WEB FUNCTION MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  27.09.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019Refusal of applicationpublished on 30.10.2019  [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Haixin
c/o ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date12865884.628.05.2012
WO2012CN76160
Priority number, dateCN2012101781019.01.2012         Original published format: CN201210017810
[2014/43]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013107142
Date:25.07.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2793429
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN25.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/24, H04L29/06, H04M3/42, H04Q3/62
[2015/01]
Former International [2014/43]H04L12/24
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERWALTUNG EINES WEBFUNKTIONSMODULS[2014/43]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MANAGING WEB FUNCTION MODULE[2014/43]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE MODULE DE FONCTION WEB[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase16.07.2014Translation filed 
16.07.2014National basic fee paid 
16.07.2014Search fee paid 
16.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
11.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.2019Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/44]
15.05.2019Date of oral proceedings
13.06.2019Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/44]
13.06.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.05.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
26.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
26.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
28.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
09.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]CN1870695  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2011177797  (VENDROW VLAD [US] ET AL) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2007025950  (SIEMENS AG [DE]; HUANG JIAN FEN [CN]; HU YI JUN [CN]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
International search[A]CN1996879  (HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.);
 [A]CN101251860  (BEIHANG UNIVERSITY);
 [A]CN101763428  (SHANDONG INSPUR SOFTWARE CO., LTD.)