Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2806699

EP2806699 - RADIO COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE, RADIO COMMUNICATIONS METHOD AND MACHINE READABLE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/48]RADIO COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE AND SYSTEM, RADIO COMMUNICATIONS METHOD AND MACHINE READABLE MEDIUM
[2018/24]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.09.2018
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK, IT, LU
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2014/48]
Inventor(s)01 / CUI, Qimei
No.10
Xitu Cheng Road
Haidian District
Beijing 100-876 / CN
02 / ZHANG, Yingni
No.10
Xitu Cheng Road
Haidian District
Beijing 100-876 / CN
03 / LI, Xiaona
No.10
Xitu Cheng Road
Haidian District
Beijing 100-876 / CN
04 / LI, Shiyuan
No.10
Xitu Cheng Road
Haidian District
Beijing 100-876 / CN
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2018/44]
Former [2014/48]Turner, James Arthur , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date12866121.228.11.2012
[2018/44]
WO2012CN85462
Priority number, dateCN2012101997820.01.2012         Original published format: CN201210019978
[2014/48]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013107220
Date:25.07.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2806699
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2806699
Date:31.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN25.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/024, H04W76/15, H04L1/00, // H04B7/0417, H04B7/06, H04W72/08, H04L5/00
[2018/24]
Former International [2015/42]H04B7/02, // H04B7/04, H04B7/06, H04W72/08, H04L5/00
Former International [2014/48]H04W72/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG, FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND MASCHINENLESBARES MEDIUM[2018/24]
English:RADIO COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE, RADIO COMMUNICATIONS METHOD AND MACHINE READABLE MEDIUM[2018/24]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATIONS RADIO, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATIONS RADIO ET SUPPORT LISIBLE PAR MACHINE[2018/24]
Former [2014/48]FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND -SYSTEM, FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND MASCHINENLESBARES MEDIUM
Former [2014/48]RADIO COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE AND SYSTEM, RADIO COMMUNICATIONS METHOD AND MACHINE READABLE MEDIUM
Former [2014/48]DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATIONS RADIO, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATIONS RADIO ET SUPPORT LISIBLE PAR MACHINE
Entry into regional phase09.07.2014Translation filed 
12.08.2014National basic fee paid 
12.08.2014Search fee paid 
12.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
12.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
26.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
24.09.2018Fee for grant paid
24.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.05.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
17.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
24.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
LU28.11.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
[2019/34]
Former [2019/26]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/25]AT31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/24]AT31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/23]AT31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/22]FI31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
NO31.01.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT31.10.2018
NO31.01.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2010271968  (LIU LINGJIA [US], et al) [X] 1,7,14,20 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0027]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0061]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0092]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0106] * * paragraph [0130] * * paragraph [0162]; figure 10 * [I] 2-6,8-13,15-19;
 [A]WO2010140860  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-20 * figures 2,7,13 *
International search[X]US2011237272  (GOROKHOV ALEXEI YURIEVITCH [US], et al);
 [A]CN101951307  (UNIV XIDIAN)