blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2806699


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
17.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.06.2019  [2019/25]
10.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
03.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.06.2019  [2019/23]
26.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.05.2019  [2019/22]
19.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.05.2019  [2019/21]
12.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.05.2019  [2019/20]
28.09.2018 (Expected) grant published on  31.10.2018  [2018/44]
26.09.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
26.09.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
18.09.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
22.05.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
11.05.2018 Change - classification published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
11.05.2018 Change - classification published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
11.05.2018 Change - German title published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
11.05.2018 Change - English title published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
11.05.2018 Change - French title published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
29.11.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.11.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.01.2016 Amendment by applicant
21.09.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.09.2015 Change - classification published on  14.10.2015  [2015/42]
11.09.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  14.10.2015  [2015/42]
07.07.2015 Change - representative
27.03.2015 Change - extension states published on  29.04.2015  [2015/18]
17.12.2014 Change - representative
20.11.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
24.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
20.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
15.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
13.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
11.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
11.07.2014 Amendment by applicant
10.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
07.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
26.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication