blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2806699 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201210019978 EP12866121



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9693279Global Dossier 27.06.2017B2
US2015016425 15.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
CN201210019978 20.01.2012
WO2012CN85462 28.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20140120911Global Dossier 14.10.2014A
Priority number Date
CN201210019978 20.01.2012
WO2012CN85462 28.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101756613BGlobal Dossier 10.07.2017B1
KR20160130872 14.11.2016A
Priority number Date
CN201210019978 20.01.2012
WO2012CN85462 28.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5915774BGlobal Dossier 11.05.2016B2
JP2015509328 26.03.2015A
Priority number Date
CN201210019978 20.01.2012
WO2012CN85462 28.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2860839Global Dossier 23.10.2018C
CA2860839 25.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
CN201210019978 20.01.2012
WO2012CN85462 28.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2806699Global Dossier 31.10.2018B1
EP2806699 14.10.2015A4
EP2806699 26.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
CN201210019978 20.01.2012
WO2012CN85462 28.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2012366980B 12.05.2016B2
AU2012366980 24.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
CN201210019978 20.01.2012
WO2012CN85462 28.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112014017256 04.07.2017A8
BR112014017256 13.06.2017A2
Priority number Date
CN201210019978 20.01.2012
WO2012CN85462 28.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA3018902 25.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
CN201210019978 20.01.2012
CA2860839 28.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX343103 25.10.2016B
MX2014008122 22.09.2014A
Priority number Date
CN201210019978 20.01.2012
WO2012CN85462 28.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2580935 10.04.2016C2
RU2014134070 20.03.2016A
Priority number Date
CN201210019978 20.01.2012
WO2012CN85462 28.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ZA201405844 29.10.2014B
Priority number Date
CN201210019978 20.01.2012
WO2012CN85462 28.11.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013107220Global Dossier 25.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
CN201210019978 20.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN103220079BGlobal Dossier 25.05.2018B
CN103220079 24.07.2013A
Priority number Date
CN201210019978 20.01.2012