Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2793505

EP2793505 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR REPORTING FGI CAPABILITY BY TERMINAL AND ASSIGNING MEASUREMENT TASK BY NETWORK SIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.04.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.05.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[2018/23]
Former [2014/43]For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Zhongming
c/o ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / DU, Zhongda
c/o ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Appleyard Lees IP LLP
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
[2018/23]
Former [2014/43]Waddington, Richard
Appleyard Lees
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
Application number, filing date12866123.828.06.2012
[2018/23]
WO2012CN77757
Priority number, dateCN2012101900620.01.2012         Original published format: CN201210019006
[2014/43]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013107155
Date:25.07.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2793505
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2793505
Date:06.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN25.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W24/10, H04W8/24, H04W36/00, H04L12/26
[2015/45]
Former International [2014/43]H04W24/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR MELDUNG DER FGI-KAPAZITÄT EINES ENDGERÄTS UND ZUR NETZWERKSEITIGEN ZUWEISUNG VON MESSUNGSAUFGABEN[2014/43]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR REPORTING FGI CAPABILITY BY TERMINAL AND ASSIGNING MEASUREMENT TASK BY NETWORK SIDE[2014/43]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR RENDRE COMPTE DE L'APTITUDE D'UN TERMINAL À METTRE EN UVRE LA FONCTION FGI ET POUR FAIRE AFFECTER UNE TÂCHE DE MESURE PAR LE CÔTÉ RÉSEAU[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2014Translation filed 
17.07.2014National basic fee paid 
17.07.2014Search fee paid 
17.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
15.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.04.2018Fee for grant paid
24.04.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.04.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.01.2018
Opposition(s)07.03.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
26.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
DK06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
IT06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
MC06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SI06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
IE28.06.2018
LU28.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
FR06.08.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
[2019/38]
Former [2019/26]AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
DK06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
IT06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
MC06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SI06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
IE28.06.2018
LU28.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/24]AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
IT06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
MC06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
IE28.06.2018
LU28.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/21]AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
IT06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
MC06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
IE28.06.2018
LU28.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/19]AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
IT06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
MC06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
IE28.06.2018
LU28.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/17]AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
IT06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
MC06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
LU28.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/15]AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
IT06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
MC06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/11]AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
IT06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/10]AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/09]CY06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/08]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/03]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
Former [2018/52]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
Former [2018/51]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
Former [2018/50]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
Former [2018/47]ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
NO06.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]  - TSG RAN, "LS on FGI handling for inter-RAT ANR", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-120025_RP-111772, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111220), vol. RAN WG2, no. Dresden, Germany; 20120206 - 20120210, XP050565792 [X] 1,2,6,7 * chapter 1, chapter 2 * [I] 3-5,8-11
 [XI]  - ZTE, "UMTS SON ANR - Email Discussion Report on CELL_DCH Based Approach", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-105428 [71#53] UMTS SON ANR EMAIL DISCUSSION REPORT ON CELL_DCH BASED (SI-READING) APPROACH, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20101010), vol. RAN WG2, no. Xi'an, China; 20101011 - 201010, XP050605460 [X] 4,9,11 * chapter 4.3.1 * [I] 1-3,5-8,10
 [A]  - ALCATEL-LUCENT ET AL, "Clarification of the event B1 and ANR related FGI bits", 3GPP DRAFT; 36331_CR0835_(REL-10)_R2-116386-FGI-ANR-CR-V4, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111118), vol. RAN WG2, no. San Francisco, USA; 20111114, XP050564618 [A] 1-11 * abstract * * chapter B.1 *
 [A]  - LG ELECTRONICS INC, "Capability indication of handover support between LTE FDD and LTE TDD", 3GPP DRAFT; 36331_CRXXXX_(REL-10)_R2-113282 FGI BIT FOR INTER-FREQUENCY MEASUREMENTS AND REPORTING V2, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110503), vol. RAN WG2, no. Barcelona, Spain; 20110509, XP050495220 [A] 1-11 * abstract *
International search[A]CN102264092  (ZTE CORP.);
 [A]WO2011021593  (NEC CORP.)
 [A]  - "3GPP TSG RAN; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Radio Resource Control (RRC); Protocol specification (Release 8)", 3GPP TS 36.331 V8.13.0, (20110322), pages 1 - 213, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Specs/archive/36_series/36.331/, XP050476365