Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2793505


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.09.2019  [2019/38]
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
10.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
19.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.05.2019  [2019/21]
12.04.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  15.05.2019  [2019/20]
05.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.05.2019  [2019/19]
22.03.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
08.03.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
08.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
01.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
25.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2019  [2019/09]
18.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
14.12.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.01.2019  [2019/03]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
16.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.12.2018  [2018/51]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
19.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
15.05.2018 (Expected) grant published on  06.06.2018  [2018/23]
27.04.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
27.04.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
24.04.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
02.01.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.11.2017 Amendment by applicant
29.06.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.07.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.06.2016 Amendment by applicant
20.11.2015 Change - classification published on  23.12.2015  [2015/52]
20.11.2015 Change - classification published on  23.12.2015  [2015/52]
02.10.2015 Change - classification published on  04.11.2015  [2015/45]
02.10.2015 Change - classification published on  04.11.2015  [2015/45]
02.10.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  04.11.2015  [2015/45]
29.06.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.03.2015 Change - extension states published on  29.04.2015  [2015/18]
18.02.2015 Change - representative
19.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.10.2014  [2014/43]
19.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  22.10.2014  [2014/43]
11.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
19.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
22.07.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
07.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
26.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication