Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2793505 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201210019006 EP12866123



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9565585Global Dossier 07.02.2017B2
US2014341116 20.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012CN77757 28.06.2012
CN201210019006 20.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2015511420Global Dossier 16.04.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2012CN77757 28.06.2012
CN201210019006 20.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2793505Global Dossier 06.06.2018B1
EP2793505 04.11.2015A4
EP2793505 22.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012CN77757 28.06.2012
CN201210019006 20.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013107155Global Dossier 25.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
CN201210019006 20.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN103220711BGlobal Dossier 03.08.2018B
CN103220711 24.07.2013A
Priority number Date
CN201210019006 20.01.2012