Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2760207

EP2760207 - IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.01.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.02.2017  [2017/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Honda Motor Co., Ltd.
1-1, Minami-Aoyama, 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8556 / JP
[2014/31]
Inventor(s)01 / KANOU, Tadahiko
c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD.
4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP
02 / ADACHI, Masahiko
c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD.
4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP
 [2014/31]
Representative(s)Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/31]Prechtel, Jörg
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date12866134.529.11.2012
WO2012JP80894
Priority number, dateJP2012000694717.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012006947
[2014/31]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013108493
Date:25.07.2013
Language:JA
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2760207
Date:30.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP25.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04N9/07, H04N5/225, H04N5/238, H04N9/04
[2015/31]
Former International [2014/31]H04N9/07, H04N5/225, H04N5/238
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/31]
TitleGerman:BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2014/31]
English:IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE[2014/31]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE[2014/31]
Entry into regional phase24.04.2014Translation filed 
24.04.2014National basic fee paid 
24.04.2014Search fee paid 
24.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/31]
14.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.09.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/08]
18.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/08]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.05.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201605   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2011085062  (RHODES HOWARD E [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0021] , [0 31] * [A] 2-8;
 [A]US6784939  (LEE SUK-JOONG [KR] ET AL) [A] 1 * column 3, line 56 - line 63 * * column 4, line 45 - line 61 *
International search[A]JP2010199849  (TOSHIBA CORP.);
 [A]JP2011114576  (CANON INC.);
 [A]JP2008104010  (SONY CORP.);
 [A]JP2011066637  (SONY CORP.);
 [A]JP2007180811  (KYOCERA CORP.)
by applicantJP2008507908