Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2808978

EP2808978 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND FEED SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / AKIYOSHI Koichi
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
02 / URAMOTO Yoichi
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2019/25]
Former [2014/49]Davies, Simon Robert
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date12866518.913.12.2012
[2019/25]
WO2012JP82301
Priority number, dateJP2012001483427.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012014834
JP2012009383617.04.2012         Original published format: JP 2012093836
[2014/49]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013111469
Date:01.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2808978
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2808978
Date:19.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP01.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01M10/46, H02J7/02, H02J50/12, H02J50/80, // H02J50/05, H02J50/40, H02J50/60
[2019/02]
Former International [2015/46]H02J17/00, H01M10/46, H02J7/00, H02J7/34, H02J7/02
Former International [2014/49]H02J17/00, H01M10/46, H02J7/00, H02J7/34
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND ZUFÜHRSYSTEM[2014/49]
English:ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND FEED SYSTEM[2014/49]
French:DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase01.07.2014Translation filed 
02.08.2014National basic fee paid 
02.08.2014Search fee paid 
02.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
02.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
13.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
09.05.2019Fee for grant paid
09.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.01.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
19.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
NO19.09.2019
[2019/47]
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2009195214  (GEHRKE DIRK [DE] ET AL) [X] 1,10,11 * paragraphs [0024] - [0030]; figures 1,3 * [I] 2-9;
 [I]US2008150483  (MORITA KAZUKI [JP] ET AL) [I] 1-6,11 * paragraph [0256]; figure 12; claim 5 *;
 [I]US2005200335  (YANO TAKASHI [JP]) [I] 1-6,11 * paragraphs [0063] - [0066]; figure 7; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]US2007262651  (ODAOHARA SHIGEFUMI [JP]) [A] 1,11 * paragraph [0032]; figure 4 *
International search[A]JP2010028897  (SEIKO EPSON CORP.);
 [A]JP2005278273  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2008182872  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.)
by applicantJP2001102974
 WO0027531
 JP2008206233
 JP2002034169
 JP2005110399
 JP2010063245