Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807756

EP2807756 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SELECTING PRECODING MATRICES BASED ON REPRESENTATIONS OF SPEED OF RELATED DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.02.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / NAMMI, Sairamesh
Ringstedsgatan 39
S-16448 Stockholm / SE
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Brann AB
P.O. Box 3690
Drottninggatan 27
103 59 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich
Ericsson AB
Patent Unit Kista RAN 1
Torshamnsgatan 23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date12866558.523.01.2012
WO2012SE50052
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013112079
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807756
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE01.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/04
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSWAHL VON VORCODIERUNGSMATRIZEN AUF BASIS VON DARSTELLUNGEN DER GESCHWINDIGKEIT ENTSPRECHENDER VORRICHTUNGEN[2014/49]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SELECTING PRECODING MATRICES BASED ON REPRESENTATIONS OF SPEED OF RELATED DEVICES[2014/49]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE SÉLECTIONNER DES MATRICES DE PRÉCODAGE SUR LA BASE DE REPRÉSENTATIONS DE LA VITESSE DE DISPOSITIFS ASSOCIÉS[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase19.06.2014National basic fee paid 
19.06.2014Search fee paid 
19.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
19.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
03.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.08.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.02.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
29.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
28.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2009086648  (XU HUA [CA] ET AL) [X] 1-4,6-9,13-15 * paragraphs [0015] , [0017] , [0018] , [0021] , [0034] , [0035]; figure 3 * [I] 5,10-12
International search[X]US2009086648  (XU HUA ET AL);
 [X]JP2011029894  (KDDI CORP);
 [A]US2009034639  (HWANG IN-SOO ET AL);
 [A]WO2009099151  (SHARP KK ET AL);
 [A]WO2011123976  (ALCATEL LUCENT SHANGHAI BELL ET AL)
by applicantUS2009086648