Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2810243

EP2810243 - CONTENT-AWARE IMAGE RESIZING USING SUPERPIXELS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.01.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.02.2019  [2019/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / SAPATOV, Alexander Sergeevich
Profsoyuznaya st. 46
block 1 appt. 39
Moscow 117335 / RU
02 / RAGOZIN, Dmitry Vasilievich
Turgeneva st. 30
Nizhny Novgorod, 603950 / RU
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date12866642.725.01.2012
WO2012RU00031
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013112064
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2810243
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU01.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06T1/00, G06K9/34
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
TitleGerman:INHALTSBEWUSSTE BILDGRÖSSENÄNDERUNG MIT SUPERPIXELN[2014/50]
English:CONTENT-AWARE IMAGE RESIZING USING SUPERPIXELS[2014/50]
French:REDIMENSIONNEMENT D'IMAGE EN FONCTION DU CONTENU AU MOYEN DE SUPER PIXELS[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase10.07.2014National basic fee paid 
10.07.2014Search fee paid 
10.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
11.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.09.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/08]
11.10.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/08]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.07.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[YD]  - AVIDAN S ET AL, "Seam carving for content-aware image resizing", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON GRAPHICS (TOG), ACM, US, (20070701), vol. 26, no. 3, pages 1 - 9, XP002471179 [YD] 1-15 * page 4, column r, paragraph 3 - page 7, column l, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1239451.1239461
 [Y]  - ARAUJO JR AND N LEITE F, "A Morphological Algorithm for Photomosaicking", (19960101), pages 181 - 186, SIGNAL PROCESSING VIII : THEORIES AND APPLICATIONS ; PROCEEDINGS OF EUSIPCO-96, EIGHTH EUROPEAN SIGNAL PROCESSING CONFERENCE; TRIESTE, ITALY, 10 - 13 SEPTEMBER 1996, URL: http://www.eurasip.org/Proceedings/Eusipco/1996/paper/pip_5.pdf, XP009151981 [Y] 1-15 * page 1882, column r, paragraph 2 - paragraph 5 *
 [A]  - F. DRUCKER AND J. MACCORMICK, "Fast Superpixels for Video Analysis", MOTION AND VIDEO COMPUTING, 2009, (20091208), pages 1 - 8, XP002745420 [A] 1-15 * page 1, column r, paragraph 3 *
 [A]  - SETLUR V ET AL, "Retargeting Images and Video for Preserving Information Saliency", IEEE COMPUTER GRAPHICS AND APPLICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20070901), vol. 27, no. 5, pages 80 - 88, XP011191901 [A] 1-15 * page 80, column r, paragraph l - page 81, column l, paragraph 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCG.2007.133
 [A]  - MOORE A P ET AL, "Superpixel lattices", COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION, 2008. CVPR 2008. IEEE CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080623), pages 1 - 8, XP031297029 [A] 1-15 * abstract *
 [A]  - MEYER F, "AN OVERVIEW OF MORPHOLOGICAL SEGMENTATION", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PATTERN RECOGNITION AND ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE (IJPRAI), WORLD SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHING, SI, (20011101), vol. 15, no. 7, pages 1089 - 1118, XP001110317 [A] 1-15 * page 1096, paragraph 2 - page 1103, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1142/S0218001401001337
International search[Y]US2007116347  (SIEMENS CORPORATE RESEARCH INC);
 [Y]US6792329  (MILLIKEN &COMPANY);
 [Y]US2005216237  (JEFFREY MINORU ADACHI ET AL);
 [Y]US2010027876  (SHMUEL AVIDAN ET AL);
 [A]RU2321063  (MICROSOFT CORPORATION)