Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2816296

EP2816296 - AIR CONDITIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.08.2018
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Daikin Industries, Ltd.
Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / TAKATA, Nobuyoshi
c/o Daikin Industries, Ltd.
Umeda Center Building
4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome
Kita-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
02 / MORIGUCHI Akira
c/o Daikin Industries, Ltd.
Umeda Center Building
4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome
Kita-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2014/52]
Application number, filing date12866646.822.11.2012
[2017/40]
WO2012JP80264
Priority number, dateJP2012001375826.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012013758
[2014/52]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013111436
Date:01.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2816296
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2816296
Date:04.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP01.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:F24F11/00, F24F11/02, F25B49/02
[2017/22]
Former International [2016/02]F24F11/02, F24F11/00
Former International [2014/52]F24F11/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KLIMAANLAGE[2014/52]
English:AIR CONDITIONER[2014/52]
French:CLIMATISEUR[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase26.08.2014Translation filed 
26.08.2014National basic fee paid 
26.08.2014Search fee paid 
26.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
11.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.08.2017Fee for grant paid
24.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.05.2017
Opposition(s)05.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
18.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
24.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.11.2012
AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SI04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
IE22.11.2017
LU22.11.2017
MT22.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
[2019/31]
Former [2018/52]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SI04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
IE22.11.2017
LU22.11.2017
MT22.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/50]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
IE22.11.2017
LU22.11.2017
MT22.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/45]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
IE22.11.2017
LU22.11.2017
MT22.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/43]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
LU22.11.2017
MT22.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
LU22.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/38]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
LU22.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/36]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/22]FI04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
NO04.01.2018
Former [2018/17]NL04.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[AD]JP4547950B  (DAIKIN KOGYO KK) [AD] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [AD]JPS63306346  (DAIKIN IND LTD) [AD] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]JP2009041857  (SHARP KK) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]JP2001355896  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al) [A] 1 * abstract *
International search[Y]JP2009041857  (SHARP KK);
 [Y]JP2001355896  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al)
by applicantJP4547950B
 JPS63306346