Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2808919

EP2808919 - BATTERY HOLDER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.09.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.11.2016  [2016/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Tokai Rika Denki Seisakusho
260 Toyota 3-chome Ohguchi-cho Niwa-gun
Aichi 480-0195 / JP
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / NISHIDA, Kota
c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI RIKA DENKI SEISAKUSHO
260 Toyota 3-chome
Ohguchi-cho
Niwa-gun Aichi 480-0195 / JP
02 / KOGA, Shinichi
c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI RIKA DENKI SEISAKUSHO
260 Toyota 3-chome
Ohguchi-cho
Niwa-gun Aichi 480-0195 / JP
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2014/49]
Application number, filing date12866775.521.12.2012
WO2012JP83319
Priority number, dateJP2012001225424.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012012254
[2014/49]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013111488
Date:01.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2808919
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP01.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01M2/10, // G07C9/00, B60R25/40
[2015/43]
Former International [2014/49]H01M2/10, E05B19/00, H05K5/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
TitleGerman:BATTERIEHALTER[2014/49]
English:BATTERY HOLDER[2014/49]
French:SUPPORT DE PILE[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase27.06.2014Translation filed 
27.06.2014National basic fee paid 
27.06.2014Search fee paid 
27.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
20.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/44]
31.05.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201504   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5980309  (FRANTZ ROBERT HOUSTON [US] ET AL) [X] 1 * figure - * * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 65 * * column 5, lines 1-22 *;
 [X]DE10004220  (LEAR AUTOMOTIVE ELECTRONICS GM [DE]) [X] 6-9 * column 1, lines 3-5 * * column 1, lines 20-27 * * column 1, lines 47-54 * * column 2, lines 32-35 * * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 1 * * figure - *;
 [A]EP1094548  (VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE [FR]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] - [0026] * * figures 1,2,4-6 *;
 [A]US5876241  (FRANTZ ROBERT HOUSTON [US]) [A] 1-9 * figures 1,3-7,10,11 * * column 3, lines 14-29 * * column 4, lines 9-14 * * column 4, lines 47-52 *;
 [A]US6603670  (CHIEN MIN JU [TW]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * figure - * * column 3, lines 19-27 * * column 4, lines 16-24 *
International search[A]JPH11185721  (TOKAI KOGYO CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2011171117  (SMK CORP.);
 [A]JP2006302527  (UNION MACHINERY CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2008277096  (JAPAN RADIO CO., LTD.)