Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2806977

EP2806977 - THERMO SPRAY GUN WITH REMOVABLE NOZZLE TIP AND METHOD MAKING AND USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Change - classificationpublished on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
11.10.2019Change - classificationpublished on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sulzer Metco (US) Inc.
1101 Prospect Avenue
Westbury, NY 11590 / US
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / MOLZ, Ronald J.
1 Birch Court
Ossining, NY 10562 / US
02 / HAWLEY, Dave
1101 Prospect Ave.
Westbury, New York 10590 / US
03 / MCCULLOUGH, Richard
344 Degraw St. 4B
Brooklyn, New York 11231 / US
 [2014/51]
Former [2014/49]01 / MOLZ, Ronald J.
9 Carol Drive
MT. Kisco, New York 10549 / US
02 / HAWLEY, Dave
1101 Prospect Ave.
Westbury, New York 10590 / US
03 / MCCULLOUGH, Richard
344 Degraw St. 4B
Brooklyn, New York 11231 / US
Representative(s)Intellectual Property Services GmbH
Langfeldstrasse 88
8500 Frauenfeld / CH
[2014/49]
Application number, filing date12866811.827.01.2012
WO2012US22906
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013112178
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2806977
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:B05B7/22, B05B1/12, B05B13/04, B05B13/02, C23C4/00, B05B15/65, // B05B1/16, B05B1/14
[2019/46]
Former International [2015/40]B05B7/22, B05B15/06, B05B1/12, B05B13/04, B05B13/02, C23C4/00, // B05B1/16, B05B1/14
Former International [2014/49]B05B1/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
TitleGerman:THERMOSPRITZPISTOLE MIT ABNEHMBARER DÜSENSPITZE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG[2014/49]
English:THERMO SPRAY GUN WITH REMOVABLE NOZZLE TIP AND METHOD MAKING AND USING THE SAME[2014/49]
French:PISTOLET DE PULVÉRISATION THERMIQUE PAR POINTE DE BUSE AMOVIBLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION DE CELUI-CI[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase27.08.2014National basic fee paid 
27.08.2014Search fee paid 
27.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
20.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)EP16181291.2  / EP3132857
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.01.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
26.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
22.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XI]US4688722  (DELLASSIO ANTHONY D [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 5, line 67 - column 6, line 16 * * figures 1,2 * [I] 7-10,16;
 [XI]US3914573  (MUEHLBERGER ERICH) [X] 1-6,16 * column 7, line 7 - column 8, line 24 * * figures 1-3 * [I] 7-10;
 [XI]US3851824  (SVENSSON O) [X] 1,16 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 3 * * figures 1,2 * [I] 9,10;
 [X]US7045738  (KOVACEVIC RADOVAN [US], et al) [X] 11-15 * column 4, line 21 - column 5, line 41 * * figures 1A,1B *
International search[X]US4437610  (HUBER ET AL.);
 [X]US6085996  (CULBERTSON ET AL.);
 [X]US7759599  (HAWLEY ET AL.);
 [Y]US5144110  (MARANTZ ET AL.);
 [Y]US2004005413  (LI ET AL.);
 [Y]US6698617  (SYZMANSKI);
 [A]US5458388  (DANEK ET AL.)