Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2809099

EP2809099 - COMMUNICATION METHOD AND COMMUNICATION TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/49]COMMUNICATION METHOD, COMMUNICATION TERMINAL AND BASE STATION APPARATUS
[2016/13]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.12.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.01.2017  [2017/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]For all designated states
Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YOKOYAMA, Hitoshi
c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Lewin, David Nicholas
Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Lewin, David Nicholas
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Application number, filing date12866932.226.01.2012
WO2012JP51702
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013111309
Date:01.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2809099
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP01.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W16/24
[2016/13]
Former International [2014/49]H04W24/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
TitleGerman:KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND KOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄT[2016/13]
English:COMMUNICATION METHOD AND COMMUNICATION TERMINAL[2016/13]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION ET TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION[2016/13]
Former [2014/49]KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN, KOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄT UND BASISSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG
Former [2014/49]COMMUNICATION METHOD, COMMUNICATION TERMINAL AND BASE STATION APPARATUS
Former [2014/49]PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION, TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION ET APPAREIL DE STATION DE BASE
Entry into regional phase01.07.2014Translation filed 
20.08.2014National basic fee paid 
20.08.2014Search fee paid 
20.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
20.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
12.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.07.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/03]
01.09.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2017/03]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.03.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
06.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
03.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]US7076245  (SATAPATHY DURGA PRASAD [US]) [X] 1-6,8,10,12,14 * column 7, line 45 - column 12, line 10 * [I] 7,9,11,13;
 [XI]US2001016488  (HAYMES CHARLES LOUIS [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,10,12,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0020] * [I] 7,9,11,13;
 [A]US2011167128  (RAGHUNATHAN BADRI [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0044] *
International search[A]US2005136911  (CSAPO JOHN S [US], et al);
 [A]JP2004364223  (NEC COMMUNICATION SYST);
 [A]JP2009049755  (NEC SAITAMA LTD)
by applicantWO2009060935