Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2808725

EP2808725 - HEAD-MOUNTED DISPLAY DEVICE WITH A LIGHT-SHIELDING MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/49]DISPLAY DEVICE
[2018/17]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2019
Database last updated on 22.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / MACHIDA, Akio
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
02 / SAKAMOTO, Yukinari
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
 [2015/19]
Former [2014/49]01 / MACHIDA Akio
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
02 / SAKAMOTO Yukinari
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2018/39]
Former [2014/49]Malden, Nicholas
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date12866948.814.12.2012
[2018/39]
WO2012JP82461
Priority number, dateJP2012001224424.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012012244
[2014/49]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013111471
Date:01.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2808725
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2808725
Date:26.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP01.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:G02B27/02, G02F1/13, G02F1/1335, H04N5/64, G02B26/08, G02B27/28, G02B27/01, G02B26/10
[2016/14]
Former International [2014/49]G02B27/02, G02F1/13, G02F1/1335, H04N5/64
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOPFMONTIERTE ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG MIT LICHTABSCHIRMELEMENT[2018/17]
English:HEAD-MOUNTED DISPLAY DEVICE WITH A LIGHT-SHIELDING MEMBER[2018/17]
French:DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE MONTÉ SUR LA TÊTE AVEC ÉLÉMENT PARE-LUMIÈRE[2018/17]
Former [2014/49]ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG
Former [2014/49]DISPLAY DEVICE
Former [2014/49]DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE
Entry into regional phase27.06.2014Translation filed 
05.08.2014National basic fee paid 
05.08.2014Search fee paid 
05.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
05.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
08.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
20.08.2018Fee for grant paid
20.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.04.2018
Opposition(s)27.06.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL26.09.2018
AT26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
DK26.09.2018
EE26.09.2018
ES26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
IT26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
MC26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
SK26.09.2018
SM26.09.2018
LU14.12.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
PT26.01.2019
[2019/40]
Former [2019/39]AL26.09.2018
AT26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
DK26.09.2018
EE26.09.2018
ES26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
IT26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
SK26.09.2018
SM26.09.2018
LU14.12.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
PT26.01.2019
Former [2019/34]AL26.09.2018
AT26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
DK26.09.2018
EE26.09.2018
ES26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
IT26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
SK26.09.2018
SM26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
PT26.01.2019
Former [2019/26]AL26.09.2018
AT26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
EE26.09.2018
ES26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
IT26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
SK26.09.2018
SM26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
PT26.01.2019
Former [2019/23]AL26.09.2018
AT26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
EE26.09.2018
ES26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
IT26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
SK26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
Former [2019/22]AL26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
IT26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
Former [2019/21]AL26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
IT26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
Former [2019/12]AL26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
NO26.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT26.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[E]EP2535760  (SONY CORP [JP]) [E] 1-7,9-11 * figure 43 *;
 [AD]JP2007094175  (SONY CORP) [AD] 1-13 * the whole document *
International search[Y]WO2005093493  (SONY CORP.);
 [Y]JP2006162767  (NIKON CORP.);
 [Y]JP2012013940  (SONY CORP.);
 [Y]JP2003015075  (NIKON CORP.);
 [Y]JP2009104170  (SHARP CORP.);
 [Y]JP2006343747  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JP2006308858  (MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORP.);
 [XE]JP2012252091  (SONY CORP.)
by applicantJP2006162767
 JP2007094175
 JP2004101197
 JP3744984B
 JP2005521099
 US2004062505