Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2808725 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2808725



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 747
31.07.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
08.10.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
30.08.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
08.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.08.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
08.08.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
08.08.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
19.04.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
19.04.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
19.04.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
19.04.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 131
19.04.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 131
16.03.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
08.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
08.09.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
08.09.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
08.09.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
08.09.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
08.09.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
08.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.03.2016 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
04.03.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.03.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 4
04.03.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
04.03.2016 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
22.02.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
09.07.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
02.07.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
09.04.2015 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
01.04.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.04.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.11.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
13.08.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
13.08.2014 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
27.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
27.06.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.06.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
27.06.2014 Description Search / examination 83
27.06.2014 Drawings Search / examination 45
27.06.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
06.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
20.08.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 109
01.08.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
01.08.2013 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
01.08.2013 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 154