Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807626

EP2807626 - UNIFIED WAGERING DATA MODEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.11.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.07.2019New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Accenture Global Services Limited
3 Grand Canal Plaza
Grand Canal Street Upper
Dublin 4 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]For all designated states
Accenture Global Services Limited
3 Grand Canal Plaza Grand Canal Street Upper
Dublin 4 / IE
Inventor(s)01 / SIMONGINI, Alberto
1/746 Orrong Road
Toorak Victoria 3142 / AU
02 / LEE, Chia Min
1/58 Westbrook Street
Kew East Victoria 3102 / AU
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
5th Floor, Salisbury Square House
8, Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Thibon, Laurent
Cabinet Beaumont
1, rue Champollion
38000 Grenoble / FR
Application number, filing date12866971.023.01.2012
WO2012AU00052
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013110114
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807626
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU01.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06Q50/34, G07F17/32
[2015/39]
Former International [2014/49]G06Q50/34
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
TitleGerman:VEREINHEITLICHTES WETTDATENMODELL[2014/49]
English:UNIFIED WAGERING DATA MODEL[2014/49]
French:MODÈLE DE DONNÉES DE PARI UNIFIÉ[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase22.08.2014National basic fee paid 
22.08.2014Search fee paid 
22.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
17.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.07.2019
08.07.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
15.07.2019Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.11.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
25.08.201403   M06   Fee paid on   01.10.2014
Documents cited:Search[I]US2008207310  (MINDES BARRY [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0029]; figure - *;
 [I]US2005181862  (ASHER JOSEPH M [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0040]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0064]; figure 5 *
International search[X]US2006258438  (PLATIS);
 [Y]US7201658  (MARSHALL ET AL.);
 [Y]WO2010019541  (GTECH RHODE ISLAND CORPORATION);
 [A]WO2005019986  (LONGITUDE INC.)