Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2807626


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
01.11.2019 Refusal of application published on  04.12.2019 [2019/49]
14.07.2019 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
01.07.2019 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
22.01.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.01.2019 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
23.03.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
19.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.11.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
10.11.2017 First examination report
20.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.11.2016 Change - representative
23.02.2016 Amendment by applicant
20.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.08.2015 Change - classification published on  23.09.2015  [2015/39]
21.08.2015 Change - classification published on  23.09.2015  [2015/39]
21.08.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  23.09.2015  [2015/39]
27.03.2015 Change - extension states published on  29.04.2015  [2015/18]
21.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
31.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
08.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
08.10.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
19.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
26.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
26.08.2014 Amendment by applicant
22.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
09.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
02.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication