Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2807626

Designated contracting statesAL 
AT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
MK 
MT 
NL 
NO 
PL 
PT 
RO 
RS 
SE 
SI 
SK 
SM 
TR 
Examination procedure25.07.2019Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/49]
Entry into regional phase22.08.2014National basic fee paid 
22.08.2014Search fee paid 
22.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
25.08.201403   M06   Fee paid on   01.10.2014
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:03.12.2014 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:03.12.2014 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20140822
 
Event date:29.04.2015 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:14.08.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HK DE 1200960 HK
Code Expl.: REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG
 
Event date:23.09.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G06Q 50/34 20120101AFI20150814BHEP
 
Event date:23.09.2015 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED (CORRECTED)
Effective DATE:20150820
 
Event date:23.09.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G07F 17/32 20060101ALI20150814BHEP
 
Event date:13.12.2017 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20171113
 
Event date:25.07.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R003
Code Expl.:-REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL