Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2810407 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2810407



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 162
14.02.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 1
10.11.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
01.06.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 8
01.06.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
31.05.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
25.05.2016 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 2
24.05.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
23.05.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
04.05.2016 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 53
17.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.03.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
17.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
17.03.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
17.03.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 6
17.03.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
17.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.09.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
01.09.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
01.09.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 4
01.09.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
18.08.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
03.03.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
30.01.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
22.01.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
22.01.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
21.01.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
21.01.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
12.11.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
05.09.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
03.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.08.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
17.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
17.07.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
17.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
13.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
08.08.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
08.08.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 22