Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2810407

EP2810407 - REDUNDANT NON-LOOPING PATHS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.03.2017  [2017/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP
11445 Compaq Center Drive West
Houston, TX 77070 / US
[N/P]
Former [2016/25]For all designated states
Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development L.P.
11445 Compaq Center Drive West
Houston, TX 77070 / US
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
11445 Compaq Center Drive West
Houston, TX 77070 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GOOCH, Mark
8000 Foothills Blvd.
Roseville, CA 95747 / US
02 / WAKUMOTO, Shaun
8000 Foothills Blvd.
Roseville, CA 95747 / US
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann
Stöckeler & Zinkler & Partner
Patentanwälte
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
Application number, filing date12867032.030.01.2012
WO2012US23193
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013115777
Date:08.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2810407
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR08.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/28, H04L12/70, H04L12/18, H04L12/24, H04L12/705, H04L12/707, // H04L12/46
[2015/40]
Former International [2014/50]H04L12/28, H04L12/70
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
TitleGerman:REDUNDANTE PFADE OHNE SCHLEIFEN[2014/50]
English:REDUNDANT NON-LOOPING PATHS[2014/50]
French:CHEMINS SANS BOUCLE REDONDANTS[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2014National basic fee paid 
17.07.2014Search fee paid 
17.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
17.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.10.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/12]
10.11.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/12]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.06.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
28.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US6556541  (BARE BALLARD C [US]) [X] 1-15 * column 6 - column 12 * * column 41 - column 55 *;
 [X]US2011007663  (SCOTTON PAOLO [CH] ET AL) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0025] *;
 [X]WO2007038856  (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA]; ALLAN DAVID [CA]; BRAGG NIGEL [GB]) [X] 1-15 * page 4, lines 9-15 *;
 [X]US2009168780  (UNBEHAGEN PAUL [US] ET AL) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] *;
 [X]US2010020797  (CASEY LIAM M [CA] ET AL) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0024] *
International search[A]US7969898  (A. RAJ ET AL.);
 [A]US8064432  (J. THOMAS O' NEIL);
 [A]US2011080855  (H. T. FUNG);
 [A]US2011007663  (P. SCOTTON ET AL.)