Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2809728

EP2809728 - POLY(PHENYLENE ETHER)-POLYSILOXANE COMPOSITION AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.07.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.03.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.02.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.10.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SABIC Global Technologies B.V.
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
[2018/35]
Former [2016/22]For all designated states
SABIC Global Technologies B.V.
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
SABIC Innovative Plastics IP B.V.
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
Inventor(s)01 / GUO, Hua
WanQuan XinXin JiaYuan
Building 32
Unit-302
Beijing 100089 / CN
02 / FISHER, Scott
16 Foxhollow Greene
Delmar, New York 12054 / US
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2018/35]
Former [2014/50]Bublak, Wolfgang
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date12867220.113.12.2012
[2018/35]
WO2012US69337
Priority number, dateUS20121336242631.01.2012         Original published format: US201213362426
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013115910
Date:08.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2809728
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2809728
Date:29.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR08.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:C08L83/12, C08L71/12, C08G77/46, C08L25/06, C08L101/00
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:POLY(PHENYLENETHER)POLYSILOXANZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN[2014/50]
English:POLY(PHENYLENE ETHER)-POLYSILOXANE COMPOSITION AND METHOD[2014/50]
French:COMPOSITION DE POLY(ÉTHER DE PHÉNYLÈNE)-POLYSILOXANE ET PROCÉDÉ[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase13.08.2014National basic fee paid 
13.08.2014Search fee paid 
13.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
04.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.02.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
16.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.07.2018Fee for grant paid
23.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.04.2017
Opposition(s)31.05.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
MC29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SI29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
LU13.12.2018
IS29.12.2018
[2019/40]
Former [2019/39]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SI29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
LU13.12.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/37]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SI29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/26]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/23]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AL29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/21]AL29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/09]FI29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
NO29.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NO29.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT29.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2010139944  (GUO HUA [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0012]; claims 1-27; table 1 *;
 [Y]US4011200  (YONEMITSU EIICHI, et al) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * columns 3-6 *
International search[A]US2009318635  (CARRILLO, A. ET AL.);
 [A]US7151158  (INGELBRECHT, H. G. E.);
 [A]US2011152431  (ELKOVITCH, M. ET AL.);
 [A]US2011190454  (CARRILLO, A. ET AL.);
 [A]US6339131  (CELLA, J. A. ET AL.)