Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2809728 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2809728



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 387
03.07.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
10.09.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
02.08.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
23.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.07.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
23.07.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
23.07.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
23.07.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
16.03.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
16.03.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
16.03.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
16.03.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 37
16.03.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 37
19.02.2018 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
12.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.02.2018 Description Search / examination 3
12.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.02.2018 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
04.10.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
04.10.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
04.10.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
04.10.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 37
04.10.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 37
22.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.08.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
12.04.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
12.04.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.04.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
29.04.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
19.04.2016 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 15
19.04.2016 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 15
19.04.2016 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 1
19.04.2016 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 2
04.04.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
04.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
04.04.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
05.02.2016 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 7
05.02.2016 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 1
04.01.2016 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 2
22.09.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
22.09.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
15.09.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
03.09.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.09.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 3
03.09.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
28.08.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
12.11.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
29.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.10.2014 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
10.10.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
30.09.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
17.09.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
05.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.08.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
13.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
13.08.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
13.08.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
13.08.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
13.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
11.11.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
13.09.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 50
08.08.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
08.08.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 40