Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2809728


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2019 [2019/51]
25.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2019 [2019/48]
30.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.10.2019  [2019/40]
23.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
09.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
05.07.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  07.08.2019  [2019/32]
31.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.07.2019  [2019/27]
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
10.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
03.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.06.2019  [2019/23]
26.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.05.2019  [2019/22]
19.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.05.2019  [2019/21]
22.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
08.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
01.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
25.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2019  [2019/09]
18.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
11.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.02.2019  [2019/07]
27.07.2018 (Expected) grant published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
25.07.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
25.07.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
24.07.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
30.03.2018 Change - name/address published on  02.05.2018  [2018/18]
15.03.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
16.02.2018 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
15.12.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.10.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
23.08.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
22.04.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
14.04.2017 First examination report
16.12.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.04.2016 Change - applicant published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
08.04.2016 Amendment by applicant
14.12.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.09.2015 Change - representative
04.09.2015 Change - classification published on  07.10.2015  [2015/41]
04.09.2015 Change - classification published on  07.10.2015  [2015/41]
04.09.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  07.10.2015  [2015/41]
05.04.2015 Change - extension states published on  06.05.2015  [2015/19]
16.12.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
07.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
25.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
19.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
26.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
15.08.2014 Amendment by applicant
14.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
23.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
09.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication