Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2810252

EP2810252 - METHOD FOR SETTING AND DETERMINING DIRECTIONS OF PRINCIPAL AXES OF 3D OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip09.12.2016Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 11.01.2017  [2017/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / JIANG, Wenfei
8th Floor Building A Technology Fortune Center
No. 8 Xueqing Road
Haidian District
Beijing 100192 / CN
02 / CAI, Kangying
8th Floor Building A
Technology Fortune Center
No. 8 Xueqing Road
Haidian District
Beijing 100192 / CN
03 / LUO, Tao
8th Floor Building A
Technology Fortune Center
No. 8 Xueqing Road
Haidian District
Beijing 100192 / CN
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Huchet, Anne
TECHNICOLOR
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]Huchet, Anne
Technicolor
1, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date12867278.903.02.2012
WO2012CN70871
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013113168
Date:08.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2810252
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN08.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06T15/00, G06T19/00, G06T7/00
[2015/43]
Former International [2014/50]G06T15/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR EINSTELLUNG UND BESTIMMUNG DER GRUNDACHSEN EINES 3D-OBJEKTS[2014/50]
English:METHOD FOR SETTING AND DETERMINING DIRECTIONS OF PRINCIPAL AXES OF 3D OBJECT[2014/50]
French:PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE RÉGLER ET DE DÉTERMINER LES DIRECTIONS DES AXES PRINCIPAUX D'UN OBJET 3D[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase14.08.2014National basic fee paid 
14.08.2014Search fee paid 
14.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
14.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
01.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.12.2016Application withdrawn by applicant  [2017/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
20.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US3681783  (CHRISTOU KYRIAKOS) [A] 1,10 * abstract *
 [I]  - R Bro ET AL, "SANDIA REPORT Resolving the Sign Ambiguity in the Singular Value Decomposition", (20071001), URL: http://ca.sandia.gov/~tgkolda/pubs/pubfiles/SAND2007-6422.pdf, (20150904), XP055211335 [I] 1-10 * abstract * * page 12, line 1 - line 4 *
 [A]  - FEDERICO TOMBARI ET AL, "Unique shape context for 3d data description", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ACM WORKSHOP ON 3D OBJECT RETRIEVAL, 3DOR '10, New York, New York, USA, (20100101), doi:10.1145/1877808.1877821, ISBN 978-1-45-030160-2, page 57, XP055210718 [A] 1,10 * section 2 On the Traits and Importance of the Local RF *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1877808.1877821
International search[A]CN101350016  (FUJITSU LTD);
 [A]CN101315661  (UNIV SOUTHEAST);
 [A]CN101673312  (HONGFUJIN PRECISION IND SHENZHEN CO LTD);
 [A]US6226006  (C-LIGHT PARTNERS INC)