Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2811773

EP2811773 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION COVERAGE METHOD AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2016/26]For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Jixun
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[2014/50]
Application number, filing date12867324.129.05.2012
[2016/26]
WO2012CN76210
Priority number, dateCN2012102438703.02.2012         Original published format: CN201210024387
[2014/50]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013113198
Date:08.08.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2811773
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2811773
Date:29.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN08.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W16/26
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABDECKUNG EINER DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATION[2014/50]
English:WIRELESS COMMUNICATION COVERAGE METHOD AND SYSTEM[2014/50]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE COUVERTURE POUR COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase01.09.2014Translation filed 
01.09.2014National basic fee paid 
01.09.2014Search fee paid 
01.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
21.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.04.2016Fee for grant paid
19.04.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.04.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.02.2016
Opposition(s)30.03.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
18.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
18.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.05.2012
AL29.06.2016
AT29.06.2016
BE29.06.2016
CZ29.06.2016
DK29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
ES29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
MC29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
PL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
SI29.06.2016
SK29.06.2016
SM29.06.2016
BG29.09.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
IS29.10.2016
PT31.10.2016
[2019/31]
Former [2018/46]AL29.06.2016
AT29.06.2016
BE29.06.2016
CZ29.06.2016
DK29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
ES29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
MC29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
PL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
SI29.06.2016
SK29.06.2016
SM29.06.2016
BG29.09.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
IS29.10.2016
PT31.10.2016
Former [2018/06]AT29.06.2016
BE29.06.2016
CZ29.06.2016
DK29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
ES29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
MC29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
PL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
SI29.06.2016
SK29.06.2016
SM29.06.2016
BG29.09.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
IS29.10.2016
PT31.10.2016
Former [2017/38]AT29.06.2016
BE29.06.2016
CZ29.06.2016
DK29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
ES29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
PL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
SI29.06.2016
SK29.06.2016
SM29.06.2016
BG29.09.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
IS29.10.2016
PT31.10.2016
Former [2017/11]AT29.06.2016
BE29.06.2016
CZ29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
ES29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
PL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
SK29.06.2016
SM29.06.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
IS29.10.2016
PT31.10.2016
Former [2017/10]BE29.06.2016
CZ29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
PL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
SK29.06.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
IS29.10.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
Former [2016/52]FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
Former [2016/51]FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
Former [2016/50]FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
NO29.09.2016
Former [2016/49]FI29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
NO29.09.2016
Former [2016/46]LT29.06.2016
NO29.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2282413  (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-9 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0050] * [I] 5,10
International search[X]CN102026210  (TD TECH COMMUNICATION TECH LTD);
 [A]CN102083122  (DATANG MOBILE COMM EQUIP CO);
 [A]US2010074183  (CHEN RUNHUA [US], et al)