Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2810838

EP2810838 - VEHICLE CONTROL APPARATUS, AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING RAILROAD HYBRID VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.11.2014
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / WADA, Yasuhiko
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
02 / YAMASAKI, Hisanori
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
03 / HATANAKA, Keita
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
04 / OKADA, Yuruki
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Zech, Stefan Markus , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]Zech, Stefan Markus , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date12867351.431.01.2012
WO2012JP52181
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013114575
Date:08.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2810838
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.09.2016
ClassificationInternational:B60K6/46, B60W10/06, B60W10/08, B60W20/40, B60W20/00
[2016/42]
Former International [2014/50]B60W10/08, B60K6/46, B60W20/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
TitleGerman:FAHRZEUGSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES HYBRIDSCHIENENFAHRZEUGS[2014/50]
English:VEHICLE CONTROL APPARATUS, AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING RAILROAD HYBRID VEHICLE[2014/50]
French:APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE VÉHICULE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE VÉHICULE DE CHEMIN DE FER HYBRIDE[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase24.07.2014Translation filed 
24.07.2014National basic fee paid 
24.07.2014Search fee paid 
24.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
10.04.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2005252474  (SAH JY-JEN F [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3,6,7 * abstract * * figures 1,2,3 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] * * paragraphs [0011] , [0013] - [0023] * [Y] 5 [I] 4,8;
 [X]DE19852085  (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,6 * figure 5 * * column 2, line 41 - column 4, line 6 * * column 4, lines 32-48 *;
 [X]DE102010025183  (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,6,7 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0010] - [0011] - [0015] , [0020] , [0027] - [0034] *;
 [IY]EP1052400  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [I] 2,5 * abstract * * figures 1,9A-9C,10A-10C * * paragraphs [0005] , [0010] , [0013] , [0014] * [Y] 5
International search[X]JP2009029397  (MAZDA MOTOR CORP.);
 [Y]JP2008296907  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.);
 [Y]JP2001059437  (NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.)
by applicantJP3890459B