Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2810058

EP2810058 - RADIATION DETECTING PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.06.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Jun, Seung, Ik
5105 Leigh Avenue
San Jose, CA 95124 / US
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Markfort, Iris-Anne Lucie
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Straße 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2014/50]
Application number, filing date12867455.330.07.2012
WO2012US48907
Priority number, dateWO2012US2317130.01.2012         Original published format: PCT/US2012/023171
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013115841
Date:08.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2810058
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US08.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01N23/04, H01L27/146
[2015/34]
Former International [2014/50]G01N23/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
TitleGerman:STRAHLUNGSDETEKTIONSTAFEL[2014/50]
English:RADIATION DETECTING PANEL[2014/50]
French:PANNEAU DE DÉTECTION D'UN RAYONNEMENT[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase24.07.2014National basic fee paid 
24.07.2014Search fee paid 
24.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
17.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.10.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.06.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
12.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
28.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
23.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
24.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201605   M06   Fee paid on   12.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP2086006  (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,6,9,11,13 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0056] * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 4,5,7,8,10,12,14,15;
 [XY]CN102157533  (CARERAY DIGITAL MEDICAL SYSTEM CO LTD) [X] 1-3,6,7 * the whole document * [Y] 4,5,8-15;
 [XAY]US2009152563  (HAYASHI MASAMI [JP] ET AL) [X] 9-12 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0053] * * figures 1-4 * [A] 1-6,8 [Y] 7,13-15;
 [YA]JP2004165561  (CANON KK) [Y] 4,5,8-15 * abstract * [A] 1-3,6,7
International search[Y]US7521684  (NOMURA ET AL);
 [Y]US7956433  (OKADA ET AL);
 [Y]US2009045727  (KWAK ET AL);
 [A]US2009290680  (TUMER ET AL)
by applicantEP2086006
 CN102157533