Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2811529

EP2811529 - SILICON CARBIDE SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.10.2017
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.02.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd.
5-33 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0041 / JP
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / SHIMAZU, Mitsuru
c/o Osaka Works of SUMITOMO
ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LTD.
1-3, Shimaya 1-chome
Konohana-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 554-0024 / JP
02 / HIYOSHI, Toru
c/o Osaka Works of SUMITOMO
ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LTD.
1-3, Shimaya 1-chome
Konohana-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 554-0024 / JP
03 / WADA, Keiji
c/o Osaka Works of SUMITOMO
ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LTD.
1-3, Shimaya 1-chome
Konohana-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 554-0024 / JP
04 / MASUDA, Takeyoshi
c/o Osaka Works of SUMITOMO
ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LTD.
1-3, Shimaya 1-chome
Konohana-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 554-0024 / JP
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date12867527.914.12.2012
WO2012JP82493
Priority number, dateUS201261593681P01.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261593681 P
JP2012003698823.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012036988
[2014/50]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013114743
Date:08.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2811529
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01L29/78, H01L21/336, H01L29/12, H01L29/04
[2015/28]
Former International [2014/50]H01L29/78, H01L21/336, H01L29/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
TitleGerman:HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT AUS SILICIUMCARBID[2014/50]
English:SILICON CARBIDE SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE[2014/50]
French:DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR DE CARBURE DE SILICIUM[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase21.05.2014Translation filed 
21.05.2014National basic fee paid 
21.05.2014Search fee paid 
21.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
09.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.10.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2011180814  (HARADA SHIN [JP], et al) [X] 1,7,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0092]; figures 1-9 * [Y] 2,3,5,6,8 [I] 10,11,13,14,16;
 [Y]US6057558  (YAMAMOTO TSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 2,3,5,6,8 * column 9 - column 15; figures 3-14 *;
 [X]CA2764900  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1,4 * page 20, line 14 - line 20; figure 23 *;
 [X]CA2793969  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1,4 * page 3; figure 1 *;
 [XI]US2011169016  (WADA KEIJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,12,15 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0007]; figure 9 * * paragraph [0047] * [I] 17
International search[X]JP2012004494  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES);
 [Y]WO2010131572  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al);
 [A]JP2002261275  (SHIKUSUON KK, et al)
by applicantJP2002261275