Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807825

EP2807825 - METHODS AND DEVICES FOR CONTEXT MODELING TO ENABLE MODULAR PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.10.2016
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.11.2016  [2016/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BlackBerry Limited
2200 University Avenue East
Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / NGUYEN, Nguyen
716 Angler Way
Waterloo, Ontario N2K 4L6 / CA
02 / JI, Tianying
701 Conacher Drive
Toronto Ontario M2M 3N7 / CA
03 / HE, Dake
2200 University Ave. Ext. 78760
Waterloo, Ontario N2K 0A7 / CA
 [2015/02]
Former [2014/49]01 / NGUYEN, Nguyen
295 Phillip Street
Ext. 78776
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
02 / JI, Tianying
295 Phillip Street
Ext. 78765
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
03 / HE, Dake
295 Phillip Street
Ext. 78760
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
Representative(s)MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Patel, Binesh
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham West Midlands
B16 8QQ / GB
Application number, filing date12867607.930.01.2012
WO2012CA50051
Priority number, dateUS20121336068828.01.2012         Original published format: US201213360688
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013113088
Date:08.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807825
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA08.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:H03M7/30, H04N19/13, H04N19/18, H04N19/184
[2015/49]
Former International [2014/49]H04N7/50, H03M7/30
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR KONTEXTMODELLIERUNG ZUR ERMÖGLICHUNG EINER MODULAREN VERARBEITUNG[2014/49]
English:METHODS AND DEVICES FOR CONTEXT MODELING TO ENABLE MODULAR PROCESSING[2014/49]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIFS DE MODÉLISATION DE CONTEXTE AFIN DE PERMETTRE UN TRAITEMENT MODULAIRE[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase10.06.2014National basic fee paid 
10.06.2014Search fee paid 
10.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
10.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
10.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
28.05.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/47]
07.07.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[E]EP2621175  (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [E] 11-20 * paragraphs [[0068]] , [ [0072]] , [ [0073]] , [ [0131]]; claims 1-8 *;
 [XI]  - JI T ET AL, "Sub-Block Based Significance Map Region Classification", 8. JCT-VC MEETING; 99. MPEG MEETING; 1-2-2012 - 10-2-2012; SAN JOSE; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20120120), no. JCTVC-H0432, XP030111459 [X] 11-18 * sections 1.1, 1.2, 4.1 * [I] 19,20
 [A]  - NGUYEN N ET AL, "Significant Coefficient Flag Context Models for Modular Processing", 8. JCT-VC MEETING; 99. MPEG MEETING; 1-2-2012 - 10-2-2012; SAN JOSE; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20120120), no. JCTVC-H0411, XP030111438 [A] 11-20 * the whole document *
International search[A]US2008267513  (SANKARAN);
 [A]CA2713143  (KARCZEWICZ ET AL.);
 [A]  - MAIZPE ET AL., "Context-Based Adaptive Binary Arithmetic Coding in JVT/H.26L", 2002 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING, (2002), vol. 2, pages II-513 - II-516, XP010608021