Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2811696


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
27.10.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  29.11.2017  [2017/48]
10.07.2017 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
08.03.2017 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
08.02.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.07.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
18.03.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.03.2016 First examination report
20.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.09.2015 Amendment by applicant
05.04.2015 Change - extension states published on  06.05.2015  [2015/19]
04.02.2015 Supplementary search report published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]
30.01.2015 Change - classification published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]
30.01.2015 Change - classification published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]
21.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
07.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
11.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
19.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
12.08.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.08.2014 Amendment by applicant
08.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
20.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
09.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication