Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2811696 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280068278 EP12867669



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2013114543Global Dossier 08.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2012JP52031 30.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2014336851Global Dossier 13.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012JP52031 30.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JPWO2013114543Global Dossier 11.05.2015A1
JP5178962B 10.04.2013B1
Priority number Date
WO2012JP52031 30.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104081726Global Dossier 01.10.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012JP52031 30.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2811696Global Dossier 04.03.2015A4
EP2811696 10.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012JP52031 30.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1200997 14.08.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2012JP52031 30.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TWI441481B 11.06.2014B
TW201331075 01.08.2013A
Priority number Date
WO2012JP52031 30.01.2012