Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2811696

EP2811696 - TRAIN-INFORMATION MANAGEMENT DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SELECTING CONTROL SOFTWARE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.10.2017
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.10.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.11.2017  [2017/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / KADONO, Toshiko
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
02 / IKEJIMA, Tomoaki
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
03 / SAWA, Takuya
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
04 / KOMURA, Tetsuo
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
05 / TATSUMI, Shogo
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
06 / HONDA, Shingo
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
07 / MIYAUCHI, Takashi
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Zech, Stefan Markus , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]Zech, Stefan Markus , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date12867669.930.01.2012
WO2012JP52031
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013114543
Date:08.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2811696
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/44, G06F9/445, H04L12/24, G06F9/44, G07C5/00, H04L12/40, H04L12/46
[2015/10]
Former International [2014/50]H04L12/44
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
TitleGerman:ZUGINFORMATIONSVERWALTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUSWAHL EINER STEUERSOFTWARE DAFÜR[2014/50]
English:TRAIN-INFORMATION MANAGEMENT DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SELECTING CONTROL SOFTWARE THEREFOR[2014/50]
French:DISPOSITIF DE GESTION D'INFORMATIONS DE TRAIN ET PROCÉDÉ POUR SÉLECTIONNER SON LOGICIEL DE COMMANDE[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase07.08.2014Translation filed 
07.08.2014National basic fee paid 
07.08.2014Search fee paid 
07.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
07.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
01.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.06.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/48]
11.07.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/48]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.03.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201706   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2002107616  (DELARUELLE DALE [US]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0017] - [0021]; figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]US2006130073  (FAIST FRIDOLIN [DE] ET AL) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0035] - [0042]; figures 1-2 *;
 [A]US2004164206  (JAMMU VINAY BHASKAR [US] ET AL) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0025]; figure 3 *
International search[A]JP2003101552  (TOSHIBA CORP.);
 [A]JP2011166290  (TOSHIBA CORP.);
 [A]JPH04358169  (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD.)
by applicantJP2002127905