Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2812848

EP2812848 - FORENSIC VERIFICATION UTILIZING FORENSIC MARKINGS INSIDE HALFTONES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.07.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
10300 Energy Drive
Spring TX 77389 / US
[2019/20]
Former [2014/51]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
11445 Compaq Center Drive West
Houston, TX 77070 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ULICHNEY, Robert A.
165 Dascomb Road
Andover, Massachusetts 01810-5897 / US
02 / POLLARD, Stephen
Longdown Avenue
Stoke Gifford Bristol BS34 8QZ / US
03 / GAUBATZ, Matthew D.
14475 NE 24th Street
Bellevue, Washington 98007 / US
04 / SIMSKE, Steven J.
3404 E. Harmony Road
Fort Collins, Colorado 80528-9544 / US
 [2019/33]
Former [2014/51]01 / ULICHNEY, Robert, A.
165 Dascomb Road
Andover, Massachusetts 01810-5897 / US
02 / POLLARD, Stephen
Longdown Avenue
Stoke Gifford Bristol BS34 8QZ / US
03 / GAUBATZ, Matthew, D.
14475 NE 24th Street
Bellevue, Washington 98007 / US
04 / SIMSKE, Steven, J.
3404 E. Harmony Road
Fort Collins, Colorado 80528-9544 / US
Representative(s)Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus
Schoppe, Zimmermann
Stöckeler & Zinkler & Partner
Patentanwälte
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
Application number, filing date12867778.809.02.2012
WO2012US24450
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013119234
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2812848
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR15.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/46, G06K15/02, G06K9/00
[2015/32]
Former International [2014/51]G06K9/46
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:FORENSISCHE ÜBERPRÜFUNG MITHILFE FORENSISCHER MARKIERUNGEN IN HALBTÖNEN[2014/51]
English:FORENSIC VERIFICATION UTILIZING FORENSIC MARKINGS INSIDE HALFTONES[2014/51]
French:VÉRIFICATION JUDICIAIRE PAR UTILISATION DE MARQUES JUDICIAIRES À L'INTÉRIEUR D'IMAGES EN SIMILI[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase23.04.2014National basic fee paid 
23.04.2014Search fee paid 
23.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
11.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.08.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
23.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
20.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[Y]US7394573  (GOLDBERG DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * column 3, line 49 - line 63 * * column 4, line 58 - line 64 * * column 6, line 56 - line 65 *
 [Y]  - IMPEDOVO D ET AL, "Automatic Signature Verification: The State of the Art", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SYSTEMS, MAN, AND CYBERNETICS: PART C:APPLICATIONS AND REVIEWS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20080901), vol. 38, no. 5, doi:10.1109/TSMCC.2008.923866, ISSN 1094-6977, pages 609 - 635, XP011233353 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 611, column l * * page 615, paragraph IV. Classification * * page 616, column l, line 6 - line 30 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TSMCC.2008.923866
International search[Y]US7394573  (GOLDBERG DAVID ET AL.);
 [Y]US2004101158  (MICHAEL A. BUTLER);
 [A]US6307955  (ZANK ET AL.);
 [A]US2007188793  (WAKAI)
by applicantUS7394573
 WO0231752
    - "Automatic Signature Verification: The State of the Art", IMPEDOVO D et al., IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SYSTEMS, MAN, AND CYBERNETICS: PART C:APPLICATIONS AND REVIEWS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, (20080901), vol. 38, pages 609 - 635