Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813076

EP2813076 - EFFICIENT COMPRESSION OF 3D MODELS BASED ON OCTREE DECOMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.09.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
InterDigital VC Holdings, Inc.
200 Bellevue Parkway
Suite 300
Wilmington, Delaware 19809 / US
[2019/10]
Former [2014/51]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / TIAN, Jiang
8th Floor
Building A
Technology Fortune Center
No. 8 Xueqing Road, Haidian District
Beijing 100192 / CN
02 / JIANG, Wenfei
8th Floor
Building A
Technology Fortune Center
No. 8 Xueqing Road, Haidian District
Beijing 100192 / CN
03 / CAI, Kangying
8th Floor
Building A
Technology Fortune Center
No. 8 Xueqing Road, Haidian District
Beijing 100192 / CN
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Vidon Brevets & Stratégie
16B, rue de Jouanet
BP 90333
35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Huchet, Anne
Technicolor
1, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date12867792.909.02.2012
WO2012CN70982
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013117001
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813076
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN15.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06T9/40
[2015/39]
Former International [2014/51]H04N7/26
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:EFFIZIENTE KOMPRIMIERUNG VON 3D MODELLEN AUF BASIS EINER OCTREE-ZERSETZUNG[2014/51]
English:EFFICIENT COMPRESSION OF 3D MODELS BASED ON OCTREE DECOMPOSITION[2014/51]
French:COMPRESSION EFFICACE DE MODÈLES 3D BASÉE SUR LA DÉCOMPOSITION OCTREE[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase14.08.2014National basic fee paid 
14.08.2014Search fee paid 
14.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
14.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
15.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.10.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
20.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
16.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
20.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XA]  - BOADA I ET AL, "Multiresolution volume visualization with a texture-based octree", VISUAL COMPUTER, SPRINGER-VERLAG GERMANY, ISSN 0178-2789, (2001), pages 185 - 197, URL: http://moving.cs.upc.edu/papers/Multiresolution2.pdf, (20150817), XP002743405 [X] 1,2,14,15 * pages 190-193, paragraph 4.2.2 * * figures 1,2 * * pages 188-190, paragraph 4.2 * [A] 3-13

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/PL00013406
 [YA]  - Y. Huang et Al., "Octree-based progressive geometry coding of point clouds", Eurographics Symposium on Point-Based Graphics 2006, (200607), iGravi: Interactive Graphics & Visualization, URL: http://graphics.ics.uci.edu/upload/PBG06Yan.pdf, (20150817), XP002743406 [Y] 1,2,12-15 * pages 104-106, paragraphs 2,3 * [A] 3-11

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2312/SPBG/SPBG06/103-110
 [YA]  - JINGLIANG PENG ET AL, "Progressive geometry encoder using octree-based space partitioning", 2004 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIA AND EXPO : JUNE 27 - 30, 2004, TAIPEI, TAIWAN, IEEE OPERATIONS CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, (20040627), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/ICME.2004.1394110, ISBN 978-0-7803-8603-7, pages 1 - 4, XP010770729 [Y] 1,2,12-15 * pages 1-4 * [A] 3-11

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICME.2004.1394110
International search[A]CN1684109  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.);
 [A]WO2010151049  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.);
 [A]CN101271591  (UNIV QINGHUA);
 [A]EP2403257  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.);
 [A]  - YAN,ZHIDONG ET AL., "ROBUST ENCODING OF 3D MESH USING DATA PARTITIONING", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1999 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, (19990731), vol. 4, pages 495 - 498, XP010341188

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCAS.1999.780050