Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2814136

EP2814136 - BIDIRECTIONAL CONTACTLESS POWER SUPPLY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.02.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.10.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Technova Inc.
13th Fl. The Imperial Hotel Tower
1-1, Uchisaiwai-cho 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0011 / JP
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / ABE Shigeru
c/o National University Corporation
Saitama University
255 Shimo-Okubo
Sakura-ku
Saitama City Saitama 338-8570 / JP
02 / KANEKO Yasuyoshi
c/o National University Corporation
Saitama University
255 Shimo-Okubo
Sakura-ku
Saitama City Saitama 338-8570 / JP
03 / WATANABE Hiroshi
c/o National University Corporation
Saitama University
255 Shimo-Okubo
Sakura-ku
Saitama City Saitama 338-8570 / JP
04 / YASUDA Tomio
c/o Technova Inc.
13th Fl. The Imperial Hotel Tower
1-1 Uchisaiwai-cho 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0011 / JP
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
[2018/13]
Former [2014/51]Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Bavariaring 10
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date12867960.209.02.2012
[2018/13]
WO2012JP52970
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013118274
Date:15.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2814136
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2814136
Date:28.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP15.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:H02M7/797, B60L11/14, B60L11/18, H02J5/00, H02J7/02
[2017/43]
Former International [2015/52]H02J17/00, H02M7/797, B60L11/14, B60L11/18, H02J5/00, H02J7/02
Former International [2014/51]H02J17/00, H02M7/797
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BIDIREKTIONALES KONTAKTLOSES STROMVERSORGUNGSSYSTEM[2014/51]
English:BIDIRECTIONAL CONTACTLESS POWER SUPPLY SYSTEM[2014/51]
French:SYSTÈME BIDIRECTIONNEL D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE SANS CONTACT[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase04.09.2014Translation filed 
04.09.2014National basic fee paid 
04.09.2014Search fee paid 
04.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
01.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.02.2018Fee for grant paid
14.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.10.2016
Opposition(s)03.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
01.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
08.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
15.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL28.03.2018
AT28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
IT28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
MC28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SI28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
[2019/45]
Former [2019/26]AL28.03.2018
AT28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
IT28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SI28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2019/12]AL28.03.2018
AT28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
IT28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2019/10]AL28.03.2018
AT28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2019/08]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2019/03]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2018/52]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/50]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/47]AL28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/46]AL28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/45]FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/40]FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/35]FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
NO28.06.2018
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2009034300  (ITO HIROO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,6 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0054]; figure 1 * [Y] 2,4,5,7,8 [I] 3;
 [YD]JP2011045195  (UNIV SAITAMA; TECHNOVA KK) [YD] 2,4,5 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2010096926  (KING ROBERT DEAN [US] ET AL) [Y] 7,8 * abstract *;
 [X]US2012025942  (BHAT SUMA MEMANA NARAYANA [IN] ET AL) [X] 1 * the whole document *
International search[Y]WO2010062201  (AUCKLAND UNISERVICES LTD.);
 [Y]JP2011045195  (SAITAMA UNIVERSITY);
 [A]WO2012005607  (AUCKLAND UNISERVICES LTD.);
 [A]JP2011176914  (SAITAMA UNIVERSITY);
 [A]WO2007029438  (NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORP. SAITAMA UNIVERSITY)
ExaminationCN102025182
by applicantJP2011045195