Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2814136 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2814136



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 373
01.02.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
10.04.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
01.03.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
14.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.02.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
14.02.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
14.02.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
14.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
09.10.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
09.10.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
09.10.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
09.10.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 47
09.10.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 47
13.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.02.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
13.02.2017 Claims Search / examination 4
13.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.02.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
04.10.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
04.10.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.09.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
21.06.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
14.06.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
14.06.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
01.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.06.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
01.06.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
01.06.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
01.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.12.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
19.11.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.11.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 4
19.11.2015 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
19.11.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
10.11.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
18.02.2015 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
11.02.2015 Request for correction of errors in filed documents Search / examination 1
11.02.2015 Request for correction of errors in filed documents Search / examination 1
05.01.2015 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
19.11.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
04.11.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
16.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.10.2014 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
16.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
16.10.2014 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 2
17.09.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
15.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.09.2014 Abstract Search / examination 2
04.09.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
04.09.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
04.09.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
04.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
04.09.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 31
04.09.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 31
04.09.2014 Claims Search / examination 5
04.09.2014 Description Search / examination 31
04.09.2014 Drawings Search / examination 12
04.09.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
26.08.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
26.08.2014 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
23.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
15.08.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
15.08.2013 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
15.08.2013 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 40