Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2814136


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
04.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.11.2019  [2019/45]
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
01.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
01.02.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
18.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
14.12.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.01.2019  [2019/03]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
16.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.12.2018  [2018/51]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
19.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
14.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.10.2018  [2018/42]
07.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.10.2018  [2018/41]
31.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.10.2018  [2018/40]
03.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.09.2018  [2018/36]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
23.02.2018 (Expected) grant published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
20.02.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.02.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
17.02.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
17.02.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
08.10.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
22.09.2017 Change - classification published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
22.09.2017 Change - classification published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
15.02.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
11.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.10.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.09.2016 First examination report
17.06.2016 Change - representative
07.06.2016 Amendment by applicant
05.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.11.2015 Change - classification published on  23.12.2015  [2015/52]
20.11.2015 Change - classification published on  23.12.2015  [2015/52]
20.11.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  23.12.2015  [2015/52]
10.04.2015 Change - extension states published on  13.05.2015  [2015/20]
03.03.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
14.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
31.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
10.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
09.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
08.09.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
05.09.2014 Amendment by applicant
27.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
16.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication