Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813096

EP2813096 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AUTONOMOUS OPERATION IN CELLULAR-BASED LOCAL AREA NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.09.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.09.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.09.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 23.10.2019 [2019/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
[2019/36]
Former [2015/32]For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
Former [2014/51]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / LEI, Yixue
No. 95 of Building 15
Mingguangcun
Haidian District
Beijing 100088 / CN
02 / SHU, Kodo
Rm 2003
Tower B
46 Fang Yuan Li
Chaoyang District
Beijing 100016 / CN
03 / LI, Haitao
Rm 1-201
Building 21
Xiwangzhuang Community
Shuangqing Road, Haidian District
Beijing 100085 / CN
04 / RINNE, Mika Petri Olavi
Merenneidontie 26 J
FI-02320 Espoo / FI
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2019/43]
Former [2014/51]Nokia Corporation
Intellectual Property Department
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Application number, filing date12867969.307.02.2012
[2019/43]
WO2012CN70921
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013116984
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813096
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP2813096
Date:23.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN15.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W36/22, H04W48/06, H04W48/18
[2019/17]
Former International [2015/44]H04W48/18
Former International [2014/51]H04W8/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR AUTONOMEN BETRIEB IN EINEM ZELLENBASIERTEN LAN[2014/51]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AUTONOMOUS OPERATION IN CELLULAR-BASED LOCAL AREA NETWORKS[2014/51]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR LE FONCTIONNEMENT AUTONOME DANS DES RÉSEAUX LOCAUX CELLULAIRES[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase28.07.2014National basic fee paid 
28.07.2014Search fee paid 
28.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
19.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.08.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
01.08.2019Fee for grant paid
01.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.09.2019Information about intention to grant a patent
11.09.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.05.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[I]CN102036216  (HUAWEI TERMINAL CO LTD) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0109] - [0111] - [0146] - [0148] *;
 [A]CN102083170  (DATANG MOBILE COMM EQUIP CO) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2011150546  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 CN102369698B  [ ] (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [ ] * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2011130294  (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0104] *;
 [A]US2011171953  (FACCIN STEFANO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0363] - paragraph [0367] * * paragraph [0368] - paragraph [0373] * * paragraph [0376] - paragraph [0379] * * paragraph [0154] - paragraph [0164] * * paragraph [0165] - paragraph [0167] *
International search[X]CN102036216  (HUAWEI TERMINAL CO LTD);
 [A]CN102209348  (CHINA TELECOM CORP LTD);
 [A]CN101925064  (ZTE CORP)
by applicantCN102036216
 EP2324674
 WO2011079873