Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2813096 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2813096



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 390
04.11.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
26.09.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
11.09.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
11.09.2019 Information about intention to grant a patent Search / examination 3
11.09.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
11.09.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 23
11.09.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 23
01.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
01.08.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
01.08.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
01.08.2019 Claims Search / examination 3
01.08.2019 Description Search / examination 3
01.08.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
01.08.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
01.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
01.08.2019 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
31.07.2019 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
24.07.2019 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 8
11.04.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
11.04.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
11.04.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
11.04.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
11.04.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 24
13.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.11.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
18.09.2018 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
13.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.09.2018 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.05.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
03.05.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.04.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
19.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
19.04.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
19.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
19.04.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
19.04.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
19.04.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
19.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.04.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 24
15.04.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 20
15.04.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 28
15.04.2016 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
29.10.2015 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 2
29.10.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
23.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.10.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
23.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.10.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
16.10.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
29.09.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.09.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 5
29.09.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
17.09.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
07.07.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
18.06.2015 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 58
19.11.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
16.09.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
12.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.08.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
28.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
28.07.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
28.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
23.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
07.05.2014 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 2
15.08.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
15.08.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 24