Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2813096


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
20.09.2019 (Expected) grant published on  23.10.2019  [2019/43]
11.09.2019 New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent
11.09.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
11.09.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
11.09.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
03.08.2019 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
02.08.2019 Change - applicant published on  04.09.2019  [2019/36]
10.04.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
22.03.2019 Change - classification published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
22.03.2019 Change - classification published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
16.02.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.11.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
14.09.2018 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.05.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
17.02.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.04.2016 Amendment by applicant
12.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.11.2015 Change - inventor
26.10.2015 Change - representative
25.09.2015 Change - classification published on  28.10.2015  [2015/44]
25.09.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  28.10.2015  [2015/44]
03.07.2015 Change - applicant published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
10.04.2015 Change - extension states published on  13.05.2015  [2015/20]
14.02.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
14.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
22.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
31.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
31.07.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.07.2014 Amendment by applicant
29.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
26.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
16.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication